This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 08:22:07 (UTC).

BARRERA ROBLES VS CAVAZOS

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 BARRERA ROBLES filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CAVAZOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0015

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARRERA ROBLES, ADRIANA

Respondent

CAVAZOS, ANGELICA MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Letter Mailed; Comment: Minute Order; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRERA ROBLES, ADRIANA|RESPONDENT - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA MARIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Lamont Division B; Result: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Response to Request for Civil Restraining Order (CH-120); Filed By: RESPONDENT - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA MARIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: BY CLERK; Filed By: RESPONDENT - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA MARIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: RESPONDENT - CAVAZOS, ANGELICA MARIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Personal Service (CH-200); Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRERA ROBLES, ADRIANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Temporary Restraining Order (CH-110); Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRERA ROBLES, ADRIANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Court Hearing (CH-109); Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRERA ROBLES, ADRIANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100); Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRERA ROBLES, ADRIANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRERA ROBLES, ADRIANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Comment: NOTICE AND STIPULATION RE: TEMP JUDGE; Filed By: PETITIONER - BARRERA ROBLES, ADRIANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less