This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/11/2020 at 19:19:43 (UTC).

BARNES VS BROWN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/30/2015 BARNES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0094

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARNES, SHANNON COURTNEY

Defendants

BROWN, DOUG

BROWN, ABBE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Party: Names: BARNES, SHANNON COURTNEY; BROWN, DOUG; BROWN, ABBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: 403 S. 6th St Taft, CA 93268/Returned Original via In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Dough Brown and Abbe Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Abbe Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Doug Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned via In Pro Per Bin/Courtesy call to pick up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BARNES, SHANNON COURTNEY; Served: 10/03/2015; Served: 10/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 403 S. 6th ST TAFT, CA 93268 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via In Pro-Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less