This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:44:38 (UTC).

BARELA VS BARELA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 BARELA filed an Other lawsuit against BARELA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Schuett, Stephen D. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1639

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARELA, TARA

Respondents

BARELA, MIRANDA

SANCHEZ, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

PET RFO m/o: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET GRANDPARENT VISITATION 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: BARELA, TARA; Respondent: BARELA, MIRANDA

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

FEE WAIVER GRANTED: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $520; Parties Present Petitioner: BARELA, TARA

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: 8/14/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - PET RFO m/o: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET GRANDPARENT VISITATION 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketFather Failed to Appear for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MATERNAL GRANDPARENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - FEE WAIVER GRANTED: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketPetition for Grandparent Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less