This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 08:29:01 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELEWARE VS SUTTON

Case Summary

On 03/20/2013 BARCLAYS BANK DELEWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUTTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2298

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELEWARE

Defendant

SUTTON, ALISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE, FLINT C

1445 Huntington Dr #300

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED 3/18/14 ~ calid=2514273 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4145, CourtDate:04/11/2014, Courtroom:AR, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:3, SessionType:CCM, Judge:KP, SystemDate:3/27/2014 10:31:10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: $6,918.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION CCP 1033B(1)&(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF FLINT C. ZIDE RE: WAIVER OF INTEREST EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2014
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT, DECLARATIONS, JUDGMENT - REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: 1. INCORRECT COURT ADDRESS. DEFAULT NEEDS TO BE SERVED AGAIN AFTER CORRECTION. 2. MISSING REQUIRED FORMS/ATTACHMENTS:ORDER ALLOWING COPY OF SUPPORTING DOCUMENT TO ACT AS ORIGINAL DOES NOT HAVE DECLARATION ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 14, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 14, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for BARCLAYS BANK DELEWARE (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF HARRIS & ZIDE, check no(s) 056692. Receipt #708997 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 749

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketStatement - Comment: STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HARRIS & ZIDE - FLINT C. ZIDE