This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:56:07 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS PERFECT

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERFECT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0058

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

PERFECT, CATHERINE L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE, FLINT C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; Awarded Against: PERFECT, CATHERINE L.; Amount; Damages: $2,452.34; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $348.50; Total: $2800.84; Party: Names: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; PERFECT, CATHERINE L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs after Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Exhibits in Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Non-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less