This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/03/2020 at 18:26:14 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS LIKELY

Case Summary

On 07/25/2016 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIKELY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3926

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendants

LIKELY, JAMES E

LIKELY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODBECK, LORI

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Writ Packet

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 06/06/17, 08/08/17, 10/17/17, and 12/06/17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO FLINT ZIDE: E-FILING REJECTION OF JUDGMENT PACKAGE. THIS FILING IS FILED PREMATURELY. DEFENDANT WAS SUBSERVED ON 11/12/17.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 12/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 06/06/17, 08/08/17 and 10/17/17.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 09/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.740 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on July 5, 2017

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 08/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 06/06/2017.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 07/05/2017: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 06/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 04/04/17

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.740 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 3.740.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 01/31/2017: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: Remaining Balance: $8944.76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Los Angeles, Returned via e-file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration OF CREDITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs AFTER JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF INTEREST WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Writ Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs AFTER JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration OF CREDITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Abstract JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 4/4/17, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 01/31/2017: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED BY MAIL VIA PROCESSSERVERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less