This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:19:39 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS HARP

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HARP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

HARP, JARED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN, CARINA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal:

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Taft-Notice of OS re 3.740(d) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.