This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:42 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0310

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

GARCIA, MARIA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

FORBES, JAMIE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; Awarded Against: GARCIA, MARIA C; Amount; Damages: $2,153.19; Costs: $297.00; Total: $2450.19; Party: Names: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; GARCIA, MARIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketStatement - Comment: of Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Research to Determine Military Status of Defendant(s) ; Notice Pursuant to C.C.P 1033(b)(2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice, does 1 to 10, only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE; Served: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.