This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 08:46:51 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/24/2014 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Stainfield, Bryan K., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2883

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

HICKS, AMY

HERNANDEZ, ARMANDO G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM, REUBEN D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Original Type: Order to Show Cause; MO-OSC Re: Dismissal for FTP: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment:

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

MO-Pl Mot to Compel: Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Parties Present Defendant: HICKS, AMY

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

MO-OSC: Judicial Officer(s): Pritchard, Kenneth G., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Defendant: HICKS, AMY

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

MO-OSC: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: HICKS, AMY

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

MO - PLF'S MOTION FILED 12/10/15: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: HICKS, AMY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketMotion (Post-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Comment: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, Judgment for Possession, and Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1205 South City View Street aka 1205 City View Street Ridgecrest, CA 93555; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: HERNANDEZ, ARMANDO G.; HICKS, AMY; Party: Names: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; HERNANDEZ, ARMANDO G.; HICKS, AMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition - MO - PLF'S MOTION FILED 12/10/15: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Dec 19, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DONALD P GLENNON JR Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Dec 19, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DONALD P GLENNON JR Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for BANK OF NEW YORK (PL-1). Received from BANK OF NEW YORK, check no(s) 34548. Receipt #801190 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALCOLM CISNEROS A LAW CORPORATION - REUBEN D. KIM