This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 00:05:31 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS WANTA

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WANTA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0245

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

WANTA, MATTHEW DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Awarded Against: WANTA, MATTHEW DAVID; Amount; Damages: $11,255.22; Costs: $442.00; Total: $11697.22; Party: Names: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; WANTA, MATTHEW DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less