Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:36 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS ROHR

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROHR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1022

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

ROHR, GERALD L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FARZIN, ALI

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

KANOWSKY, CARL J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: law office of Rory W Clark New Attorney: Robert Scott Kennard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY ALI FARZIN

    Read MoreRead Less