Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 07:17:11 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS RAMEY

Case Summary

On 08/15/2016 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0432

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

RAMEY, GARY W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, MICHAEL S

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section - Comment: 68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: DESTRUCTION OF RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketStipulation - Comment: AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Notice of Settlement conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: GARY W RAMEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S