This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:54:09 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS PEREZ

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1545

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

PEREZ, ROY S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYDEN, AMARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Awarded Against: PEREZ, ROY S; Amount; Damages: $5,282.87; Costs: $290.00; Total: $5572.87; Party: Names: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; PEREZ, ROY S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO ROY S PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585d

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration - Comment: as to ROY S PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to ROY S PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO ROY S KING, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.