Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:25 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS GEORGE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEORGE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0042

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

GEORGE, MICHELLE I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE, FLINT C

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

MO-Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Comment: Re: Dismissal; Parties Present Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Consolidation After Hearing; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Awarded Against: GEORGE, MICHELLE I; Amount; Damages: $4,691.67; Costs: $348.50; Total: $5040.17; Party: Names: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; GEORGE, MICHELLE I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total: $5040.17 As To: Michelle I George

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Non-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: C.C.P. 1033 B (1) & (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Regarding Waiver Of Interest Excess Of 0% and Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As To Michelle I George

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice As To Does 10 To , Inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - MO-Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Comment: Re: Dismissal; Parties Present Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: by Personal Service as to Michelle I George

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Non-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less