This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:42 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS GAGO ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GAGO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2494

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendants

GAGO, JOHN

GAGO, MARIO

GAGO, ANGELINA

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S INTEREST OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S INTEREST THEREIN

GAGO, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McElroy, Jessica A.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: McElroy, Jessica A.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: No Proposed Order for the Judge to sign provided.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: (Case reported settled by counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Notice - Comment: of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens) (C.C.P 405.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 04/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: McElroy, Jessica A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: RE DECLARATION OF JESSICA A. MCELROY IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO APPEAR ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***4-10-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: of Jessica McElroy in Response to Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: No Proposed Order for the Judge to sign provided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to John Gago. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Maria Gago. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Notice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less