Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/21/2018 at 08:48:20 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS FEATHERSTONE

Case Summary

On 08/18/2016 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FEATHERSTONE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0443

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

FEATHERSTONE, ELDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLEA, AMANDA

Defendant Attorney

BLABER, CATHERINE E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • General Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Comment: GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: ELDA FEATHERSTONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLEA, AMANDA