This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 09:31:42 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS DHAR

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DHAR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pacione, Lisa M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0161

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pacione, Lisa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

DHAR, UNDLEEB YASIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Pacione, Lisa M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard