This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:33:15 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS CERVANTES

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CERVANTES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0316

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

CERVANTES, MICHAEL GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WANG, JERRY

HERSCH, GEOFFREY M

Defendant Attorney

SHEPARD, ROBERT L

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice:

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; CERVANTES, MICHAEL GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay) - Comment: With Prejudice, Entire Action, Duly Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Order to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 06/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: mailed to attorney's for the plaintiff and defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Served: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less