This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:54:38 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS BULLEN

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BULLEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1556

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

BULLEN, EMEVERTO D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYUN, ESTHER E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Awarded Against: BULLEN, EMEVERTO D; Amount; Damages: $8,885.42; Costs: $294.50; Total: $9179.92; Party: Names: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; BULLEN, EMEVERTO D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against Emeverto D Bullen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration - Comment: As to Emeverto D Bullen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Emeverto D Bullen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Emeverto D Bullen. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.