This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:50 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS BLAKE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLAKE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0629

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

BLAKE, DAVID B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

FORBES, JAMIE A

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for dismissal

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT, DECLARATION 1033 & JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES-RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Awarded Against: BLAKE, DAVID B; Amount; Damages: $13,026.60; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $442.00; Total: $13468.60; Party: Names: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; BLAKE, DAVID B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Determine Military Status of Defendant and Notice of Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033(B)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketStatement - Comment: of Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to David B. Blake

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT, DECLARATION 1033 & JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AGAINST DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to David B. Blake

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less