This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:54 (UTC).

BANERJEE VS GRAYSON

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 BANERJEE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRAYSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5677

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANERJEE, SUBODH

Defendant

GRAYSON, SUSAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: BANERJEE, SUBODH; Awarded Against: GRAYSON, SUSAN; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,020.00; Holdover Damages: $879.84; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $477.50; Other: $0.00; Total: $3,377.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketFinal Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Cause_of_actionCause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: SUSAN GRAYSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: SUSAN GRAYSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: SUSAN GRAYSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BANERJEE, SUBODH; Served: 10/02/20176:55 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 613 MONTEREY STREET #D, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.