This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 22:46:10 (UTC).

BANDA ET AL VS MHP BUILDERS, INC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BANDA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MHP BUILDERS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3412

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES, DANAY

WREN, LLOYD & ANNETTE

BANDA, DAVID & SONIA

PIRES, EDWARD & AMBER

SANCHEZ, AURORA

STENGEL, JAMES

ALDERETE, JOHN & ROSA

PARKER, JENNIE & STEVEN

ZARATE, DANIEL & IRINA

ALVAREZ, GABRIEL & ESMERALDA

MEDINA, LUIS BENITEZ & MODESTA

RICHARDSON, JANA

TRUJILLO, JOSE & CECILIA

LEWIS, MICHAEL & DIANE

DELFIN, MOSES & MONIQUE

MARTINEZ, RAIMUND & ELIZABETH

SANTIAGO, EVANGELINE

VILLATORO, FRANKLIN & OFELIA

Defendants

MHP BUILDERS, INC

BAKERSFIELD 112 LP

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SU, JOSEPH J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Bakersfield 112 LP via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to MHP Builders, Inc. via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Mailing as to MHP Builders, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/04/20201:47 PM; Served: 02/04/20201:47 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less