This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 04:29:26 (UTC).

BANCROFT-SPURLING VS SPURLING

Case Summary

On 11/23/2015 BANCROFT-SPURLING filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SPURLING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0213

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BANCROFT-SPURLING, JENNIE L

Respondent

SPURLING, ALANA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEIN, ROGER I

Respondent Attorney

GELBER, JAMIE P

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO Petitioner Request for Order 2/3/16: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: BANCROFT-SPURLING, JENNIE L; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: SPURLING, ALANA J

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: BANCROFT-SPURLING, JENNIE L; SPURLING, ALANA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Qualified Domestic Relations Order - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Wage & Earnings Assignment Order - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: STATUS DATE 4/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Appearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: JAMIE P. GELBER New Attorney: IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Amended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Application and Order for Reissuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Request for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.