Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:00:05 (UTC).

BALTAZAR VS MORENO

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 BALTAZAR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MORENO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Benavides, Jose R., Compton, James L., Fielder, John L. and McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1703

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Benavides, Jose R.

Compton, James L.

Fielder, John L.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BALTAZAR, NELIDA

Respondent

MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RUBIO, NIEVES

 

Court Documents

Motion - DCSS (Modification)

Motion - DCSS (Modification) 07/07/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S STND ORDERS $0 SUPPORT 2 MINORS; Parties Present Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Review

07/06/2016 MO: REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/V CONT FROM 05/25 *8; Parties Present Petitioner: BALTAZAR, NELIDA; Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Review

05/25/2016 MO: REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/V; Parties Present Petitioner: BALTAZAR, NELIDA; Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Request for Order - Petitioner

**MO - Continuance 2/24/2016 REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/V C/S; Parties Present Petitioner: BALTAZAR, NELIDA; Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Motion (DCSS)

2/24/16 MO: MOTION (DCSS) RE: JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, PARENTAGE AND: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: RE: JGMT CS HC PRNTG STD ORDS - 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 2/11/2016 *ALSO ON JRB CAL*; Parties Present Petitioner: BALTAZAR, NELIDA; Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Motion (DCSS)

2/11/16 MO: MOTION (DCSS) RE: JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND PARENTAGE: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C PARENTAGE STD ORDERS 2 MINORS

Request for Order - Petitioner

**MO - Continuance PETITIONER VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: VIS CS; Parties Present Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Request for Order - Petitioner

**MO - Continuance PET VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, CONSOLIDATE: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET CV CS CONSOLIDATE CONT'D FROM 11/20/15; Parties Present Petitioner: BALTAZAR, NELIDA; Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Request for Order - Petitioner

RFO PET M/O: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/V C/S CONSOLIDATE; Parties Present Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Request for Order - Petitioner

PET VISITATION, APPOINTMENT OF MINOR'S COUNSEL: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: VIS CS CONSOLIDATE CASES; Parties Present Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Request for Order - Petitioner

PET VISITATION - APPOINT MINOR'S COUNSEL: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: VIS CS CONSOLIDATE CASES; Parties Present Petitioner: BALTAZAR, NELIDA; Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

Request for Order - Petitioner

PET VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, CONSOLIDATION CONTINUANCE: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/V C/S CONSOLIDATION OF CASES 2 MINORS NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: BALTAZAR, NELIDA; Respondent: MORENO, FRANCISCO J.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketDCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: HRG 07/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketDCSS: Advisement of Rights Pursuant to FC 4251(b)(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Motion - DCSS (Modification) 07/07/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S STND ORDERS $0 SUPPORT 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: ATTORNEY NIEVES RUBIO New Attorney:IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 7/07/17 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: HRG 7/6/16 CCP 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: AMENDED SUMMONS AND PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - 07/06/2016 MO: REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/V CONT FROM 05/25 *8

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - PET VISITATION, APPOINTMENT OF MINOR'S COUNSEL: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: VIS CS CONSOLIDATE CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Counsel for a Child Regarding Qualifications - Comment: STEPHANIE CHILDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - PET VISITATION - APPOINT MINOR'S COUNSEL: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: VIS CS CONSOLIDATE CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - PET VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, CONSOLIDATION CONTINUANCE: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/V C/S CONSOLIDATION OF CASES 2 MINORS NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketNo Mediation Agreement - Comment: MEDIATOR; EDWARD LARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: Set by Mother/Spanish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PE MOD C/S C/V CONSOLIDATION OF CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less