This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:31:49 (UTC).

BALLEW VS ALBERTSON'S, LLC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 BALLEW filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSON'S, LLC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0167

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALLEW, KIMBERLY

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S, LLC., A CORPORATION

ALBERTSONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCELROY, STEPHEN K

WEGIS, RALPH B

Defendant Attorney

O'DELL, MICHAEL L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/11/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketJury Trial - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5-7 DAYS JURY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 2/21/23 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 5-7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: Jury Trial/Final Case Management Conference hearings are set on February 21, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 11. Mandatory Settlement Conference hearing is set on January 20, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 07/26/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Stephen K. McElroy, Esq. New Attorney: Stephen K. McElroy, Esq. with Mcelroy Parris Trial Lawyers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Defendant's Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Albertson's LLC., A Corporation via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/29/202111:49 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/11/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'DELL, MICHAEL L