This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 03:15:35 (UTC).

BALCARCEL VS ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 BALCARCEL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3107

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARLENY BALCARCEL, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ESPARZA ENERPRISES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEREMIAN, DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

ADREANI, MICHAEL B

WITT, TREVOR R.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2-13-2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Ruling

Ruling 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 02/20/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Esparza Enterprises, Inc. a California Corporation via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Date on Petition for Coordiantion of Add-On -Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Date on Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of submission of petition for coordination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: RG19005022 Alameda County; 19STCV2262 &19STCV22552 Los Angeles County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC.'S, ) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/07/20191:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2-13-2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITT TREVOR RANDALL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADREANI ESQ MICHAEL B