This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 11:21:58 (UTC).

BALCARCEL, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 BALCARCEL, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0014

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARLENY BALCARCEL, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARITOONIAN, NATALIE R.

Defendant Attorney

WITT, TREVOR R.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/17/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; party served does not conform to the Complaint throughout POS-010.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; item 5b(4), declaration of mailing is not attached. Please review.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Notice of Non-Opposition, duplicate filing received

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate 06/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 02/21/2020 Defendnant: Esparza Enterprises, Inc. Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Pursuant to C.C.P Section 403

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/16/2020: Case Management Conference 01/15/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 10/16/2020

Case Status Conference

Case Management Conference 01/15/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 01/15/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Management Conference 01/15/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 01/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 10/16/2020: Case Management Conference 01/15/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Consolidation dated 10/30/2020. Resent to 8484 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500, Beverly Hills, CA 90211

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Resent to 8484 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500, Beverly Hills, CA 90211

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Consolidation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCase Consolidated - Parent Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 10/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Granting Defendant Esparza Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Pursuant to C.C.P section 403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Defendant Esparza Enterprises Inc.'s Notice of Resubmission of Exhibit D in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Pursuatn to C.C.P Section 403

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Esparza Enterprises, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Esparza Enterprises, Inc. via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; item 5b(4), declaration of mailing is not attached. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; party served does not conform to the Complaint throughout POS-010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/09/20204:31 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/17/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESPARZA ENTERPRISES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITT TREVOR RANDALL