This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 12:37:46 (UTC).

BAISDEN VS PATTI BOWERS EXECUTIVE OFFICER BOARD OF ACCOUNTANCY DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 BAISDEN filed an Other lawsuit against PATTI BOWERS EXECUTIVE OFFICER BOARD OF ACCOUNTANCY DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0648

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAISDEN, LOWELL A.

Defendants

PATTI BOWERS EXECUTIVE OFFICER BOARD OF ACCOUNTANCY DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS STATE OF CALIFORNIA

GEILENKIRCHEN, JANE M.

GEILENKIRCHEN, EVAN J.

CALIFORNIA BOARD OF ACCOUNTANCY

PATTI BOWERS, EXECUTIVE OFFICER, BOARD OF ACCOUNTANCY, DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER AF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

FANSELOW, ZACHARY T.

WOOD, CARY L

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Special Motion to Strike - no fees submitted

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Demurrer to Complaint - Demurrer is filed but not calendared, no reservation per local rule 3.3. You can file a Notice of Hearing with the reservation number to put this matter on calendar.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "B"

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 08/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FILED 8/7/17 MOVING PARTY; PLAINTIFF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION FOR SPECIFIED DISCOVERY UNDER CCP 425.16 (g)

Motion for Judgment

Motion for Judgment 07/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/16/17 Plaintiff, LOWELL A BAISDEN Motion for Court Judgment against Defendants, GeilenKorchen by declaration pursuant to CCP 585(d); Parties Present Plaintiff: BAISDEN, LOWELL A.; Defendant; Attorney: WOOD, CARY L; Defendant; Attorney: WOOD, CARY L

Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition)

Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition) 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/27/17 Defendants, EVAN J GEILENKIRCHEN and JANE M GEILENKIRCHEN Motion for Mandatory Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs Pursuant to CCP Section 425.16 ResID: 27236

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO LOWELL A BAISDEN: REJECTIN JUDGMENT. PER JUDGE THOMAS S CLARK: JUDGMENT REJECTED. LACK OF EVIDENTIARY SUPPORT.

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 07/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 6/19/17, by Defendant, CALIFORNIA BOARD OF ACCOUNTANCY. Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. ResID: 25043.; Parties Present Plaintiff: BAISDEN, LOWELL A.; Defendant; Attorney: WOOD, CARY L; Defendant; Attorney: WOOD, CARY L

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16 X 4 08/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/5/17 Defendant, EVAN J GEILENKIRCHEN and JANE M GEILENKIRCHEN Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ResID: 25184

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 08/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FILED 8/1/17 MOVING PARTY; DEFENDANTS EVAN J. GEILENKIRCHEN & JANE M. GEILENKIRCHEN EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Ruling

Ruling 08/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: GEILENKIRCHEN, EVAN J.; GEILENKIRCHEN, JANE M.; Judgment Amount: $0.00; Awarded Against: BAISDEN, LOWELL A.; Amount; Other: $18,453.28; Other Comment: ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; Total: $18453.28; Party: Names: BAISDEN, LOWELL A.; GEILENKIRCHEN, EVAN J.; GEILENKIRCHEN, JANE M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: GEILENKIRCHEN, EVAN J.; GEILENKIRCHEN, JANE M.; Awarded Against: BAISDEN, LOWELL A.; Party: Names: BAISDEN, LOWELL A.; GEILENKIRCHEN, EVAN J.; GEILENKIRCHEN, JANE M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Original Record on Appeal (Vol. 1-5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Record on Appeal Mailed to Fifth District Court of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Receipt for Records Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Letter received from Fifth District Court of Appeal - - Comment: not suitable for mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice to parties re: fee for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Amended Notice - Comment: on Appeal/2nd Amended Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • Declaration (Meet and Confer) - Comment: OF CARY L. WOOD IN SUPPORT OF MANDATORY AUTOMATIC 30DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO PATTI BOWERS , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO PATTI BOWERS , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Evan J. Geilenkirchen. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Jane M. Geilenkirchen. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/11/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.