This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 12:25:12 (UTC).

BAISDEN VS BOWEN

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 BAISDEN filed an Other lawsuit against BOWEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0259

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAISDEN, LOWELL A.

BAISDEN

Defendants

BOWEN, SARA M.

BOWEN ACCOUNTING AND TAX

BOWEN, RICHARD A.

BOWEN CONSULTING

BOWEN ACCOUNTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BOWEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DIMARIA, MARK E

DEAN, RANDALL J

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 06/04/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16

Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16 05/24/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/23/21 RICHARD A. BOWEN; SARA M. BOWEN; BOWEN ACCOUNTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS BOWEN ACCOUNTING AND TAX AND AS BOWEN CONSULTING Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 04/28/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/29/21 Plaintiff, LOWELL A. BAISDEN Motion to Compel Discovery Responses

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons: Does not conform to complaint, missing "DOES"

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons: Does not conform to complaint; Must list at least one defendants name on the summons then state "additional parties attachment form attached" if you cannot fit all 4 defendants names on the summons.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/21/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Lowell A. Baisden For: Summons Reason: All defendants must be listed on Summons. Cannot submit a separate summons for each party.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of Order Granting Defendants' Special Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: BOWEN, RICHARD A.; BOWEN, SARA M.; BOWEN ACCOUNTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: BAISDEN, LOWELL A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED on the Complaint in this action, in favor of Defendants, and against Plaintiff; Plaintiff shall take nothing by the Complaint or any purported cause of action therein, as against Defendants; and Defendants, as prevailing parties, are awarded their costs of suit incurred herein from Plaintiff; with such costs of suit to be recovered pursuant to cost bill under California Rule of Court 3.1700, in the sum of $____________.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: 1. The Motion shall be, and hereby is, granted, in its entirety; 2. The Complaint shall be, and hereby is, hereby stricken, in its entirety; 3. This action shall be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice, in its entirety; and 4. Counsel for the Bowens is directed to prepare and to submit to the Court a proposed Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 06/04/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16 - Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16 05/24/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/23/21 RICHARD A. BOWEN; SARA M. BOWEN; BOWEN ACCOUNTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS BOWEN ACCOUNTING AND TAX AND AS BOWEN CONSULTING Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: of Unsuccessful Service as to Richard A. Bowen, 5 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: of Unsuccessful Service as to Bowen Accounting & Tax, 5 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons: Does not conform to complaint, missing "DOES"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons: Does not conform to complaint; Must list at least one defendants name on the summons then state "additional parties attachment form attached" if you cannot fit all 4 defendants names on the summons.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/29/20219:35 AM; Served: 02/24/20219:40 AM; Served: 03/29/20219:35 AM; Served: 03/29/20219:35 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/21/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Lowell A. Baisden For: Summons Reason: All defendants must be listed on Summons. Cannot submit a separate summons for each party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bowen is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIMARIA MARK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEAN RANDALL J. ESQ.