This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 23:39:02 (UTC).

BAEZA VS RUSH

Case Summary

On 05/19/2016 BAEZA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RUSH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Woodward, Cory J. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0087

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Woodward, Cory J.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAEZA, ISAI

Defendant

RUSH, HEATHER

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - UD TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment

Notice of Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing:

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

MO - UD filed 5-18-16: Judicial Officer(s): Woodward, Cory J., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: BAEZA, ISAI

Ruling

MO - RULING: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Notice of Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing:

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

MO - Unlawful detainer: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff: BAEZA, ISAI

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: BAEZA, ISAI; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 244 W. Wilson Ave. Apt. B Ridgecrest, CA 93555; Awarded Against: RUSH, HEATHER; Party: Name: BAEZA, ISAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: BAEZA, ISAI; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 244 W. Wilson Ave. Apt. B Ridgecrest, CA 93555; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: RUSH, HEATHER; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $900.00; Holdover Damages: $1,539.78; Costs: $240.00; Total: $2,679.78; Party: Name: BAEZA, ISAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - MO - RULING: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - UD TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2016
  • Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BAEZA, ISAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.