This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:16:37 (UTC).

BAEZ VS ACOSTA (C)

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 BAEZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ACOSTA C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1018

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAEZ, ELIZ

Respondent

ACOSTA, ANDREW DALE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 01/03/20 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S DEBT PYMNT ATTY F/C PYMTS COST/SRVCS RESTRAINED PARTY TO PURCHASE MISC. ITEMS FOR MINORS 2 MINORS NO SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: CT DATE 1/22/2020 MED DATE 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 01/03/20 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V C/S DEBT PYMNT ATTY F/C PYMTS COST/SRVCS RESTRAINED PARTY TO PURCHASE MISC. ITEMS FOR MINORS 2 MINORS NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.