This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 15:15:41 (UTC).

AYYOUB VS AYYOUB (C)

Case Summary

On 12/05/2016 AYYOUB filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AYYOUB C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Stainfield, Bryan K., Fielder, John L., Gill, Susan M., Cannon, Gloria, Benavides, Jose R., Robertson, Murray J., Bittleston, Dawn and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5057

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Fielder, John L.

Gill, Susan M.

Cannon, Gloria

Benavides, Jose R.

Robertson, Murray J.

Bittleston, Dawn

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AYYOUB, EDWARD

Respondent

AYYOUB, LEAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M

Respondent Attorneys

CARBONE, ROBERT F

DULCICH, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner/Claimant 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/21/17 PET CHANGE OR RETURN VEHICLE STMNT OF DEC CONTD FROM 7/3/17

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/06/16 PET C/C C/V DRUG TEST STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 2/28/17; Parties Present Petitioner: AYYOUB, EDWARD; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent: AYYOUB, LEAH; Attorney: DULCICH, JOHN S

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 04/26/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EXPARTE PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: AYYOUB, EDWARD; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent: AYYOUB, LEAH; Attorney: DULCICH, JOHN S

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FL-141

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

1/20/17 MO - HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTD FROM 1/13/17

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

1/13/17 MO - HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Respondent: AYYOUB, LEAH

Request for Order - Petitioner

1/9/2017 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC DRUG TESTING 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: AYYOUB, EDWARD; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent: AYYOUB, LEAH

Ruling

Ruling 02/01/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner/Respondent/Claimant 11/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/6/16 PET C/C C/V DRUG TEST STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 7/3/17; Parties Present Petitioner: AYYOUB, EDWARD; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent: AYYOUB, LEAH; Attorney: DULCICH, JOHN S

Request for Order - Claimant

Request for Order - Claimant 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 09/06/17 CLMNT C/V 2 MINORS 16COURT+5CAL--16COURT+3CAL; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/06/16 PET C/C C/V DRUG TEST STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 2/28/17 7/24/17; Parties Present Petitioner: AYYOUB, EDWARD; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent: AYYOUB, LEAH; Attorney: DULCICH, JOHN S

Motion

Motion 07/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 06/07/17 CLAIMANT NOM FOR JOINDER; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent; Attorney: DULCICH, JOHN S

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 06/21/17 PET CHANGE OR RETURN VEHICLE STMNT OF DEC **HEARING @1:30PM ALSO** **SERVICE ISSUES**; Parties Present Petitioner: AYYOUB, EDWARD; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent: AYYOUB, LEAH; Attorney: DULCICH, JOHN S

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 06/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 5/04/17

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND DECLARATION FOR JOINDER

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner/Respondent 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 03/16/17 PET C/S STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS **SUBPOENAED RECORDS SENT W/FILE**; Parties Present Petitioner: AYYOUB, EDWARD; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent; Attorney: DULCICH, JOHN S

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Order - Claimant - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: 09/06/17 CLMNT (GRANDPARENT) C/V 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 03/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO PETITION FOR JOINDER FILED 8/7/17 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: PAIGE EYCHEVERRY-BARNES New Attorney: IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver After Reconsideration - Ended - 10 Days - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees - Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 05/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW (RECONSIDERATION) FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: IN PRO PER New Attorney: ROBERT F. CARBONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketVoid: Entered in Error - Comment: Video 'TEST-1' completed by party on 12/16/2016 20:35:20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: HRG 01/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketDrug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC DRUG TESTING 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - 12/6/2016 MO - EX PARTE HEARING - PETITIONER'S CUSTODY, VISITATION, DRUG TESTING: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V DRUG TESTING 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 12/06/16 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less