Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:09:22 (UTC).

AVILA VS GARCIA-REYES (E)

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 AVILA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GARCIA-REYES E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Bittleston, Dawn, Gill, Susan M. and McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4054

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Bittleston, Dawn

Gill, Susan M.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AVILA, ALEXANDRA D

Respondent

GARCIA-REYES, HECTOR M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCATEE, FRED S, II

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 06/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/29/17 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 12/4/17

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 01/10/18 PET C/S ATTY F/C 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 3/12/18

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 1/10/18 PET C/S ATTY F/C 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: AVILA, ALEXANDRA D; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II; Respondent: GARCIA-REYES, HECTOR M

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 12/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 09/29/17 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 10/23/17; Parties Present Petitioner: AVILA, ALEXANDRA D; Attorney: MCATEE, FRED S, II; Respondent: GARCIA-REYES, HECTOR M

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 10/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 9/29/17 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 1 MINOR NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: AVILA, ALEXANDRA D; Respondent: GARCIA-REYES, HECTOR M

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: FRED MCATEE New Attorney: IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Stipulation/Agreement in Court (FL/DCSS); Comment: 9/16/19 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 11/19/19 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner(Initial -DCSS) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 01/10/18 PET C/S ATTY F/C -1 MINOR CONTD FROM 4/17/18 6/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: HRG: 6/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNotice Re Payment of Support - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: FOAH

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 12/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 09/29/17 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 10/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: EXP 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: CT HRG 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 10/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 9/29/17 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V 1 MINOR NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: DV SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) - Comment: EXPIRES 10/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less