This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2020 at 02:44:06 (UTC).

AURORA LOAN SERVICES V. GUTIEREZ

Case Summary

On 12/09/2009 AURORA LOAN SERVICES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUTIEREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9154

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, ITS ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS

Defendant

GUTIERREZ, VITELIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANG, REBECCA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2012
  • DocketCause Dropped - Comment: DESTROYED 7/6/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2011
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice - Comment: DESTROYED 7/6/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2010
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: CLERK JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ISSUED ~ calid=1151218 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:02/08/2010, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:donnas2, SystemDate:12/9/2009 10:46:20 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, ITS ASSIGNEES AND/OR ... (PL-1). Received from MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, check no(s) 48047. Receipt #500221 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: TO KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: DAILY RENTAL VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: RE: VITELIA GUTIERREZ & ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: RE: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS COST: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: RE: VITELIA GUTIERREZ COST: $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR TO: AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR in the above noticed court to give any legal reason why the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation could not be met. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) Court days prior to hearing date a dismissal of the entire action has been filed. If this is a notice for failure to file a dismissal of the entire action as ordered by the Court, payment of sanctions must be paid with the Request for Dismissal form. If there is any conflict of time, written requests only, showing just cause for change of hearing date is required ten (10) Court days prior to hearing. If parties are in compliance five (5) court days prior to hearing, and $100.00 sanctions are paid, no appearance is necessary. If this is a second time, a sanction of $200.00 is required to be paid. This will also serve as notice that sanctions pursuant to C.C.P. 177.5 and 575.2 will be before the court and ruled upon at that time. The hearing is set for 2/8/2010 at 1:30 PM in DEPARTMENT AT as a result of FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT, RULE 3.17.1 (c). Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR TO: AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR in the above noticed court to give any legal reason why the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation could not be met. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) Court days prior to hearing date a dismissal of the entire action has been filed. If this is a notice for failure to file a dismissal of the entire action as ordered by the Court, payment of sanctions must be paid with the Request for Dismissal form. If there is any conflict of time, written requests only, showing just cause for change of hearing date is required ten (10) Court days prior to hearing. If parties are in compliance five (5) court days prior to hearing, and $100.00 sanctions are paid, no appearance is necessary. If this is a second time, a sanction of $200.00 is required to be paid. This will also serve as notice that sanctions pursuant to C.C.P. 177.5 and 575.2 will be before the court and ruled upon at that time. The hearing is set for 2/8/2010 at 1:30 PM in DEPARTMENT AT as a result of FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT, RULE 3.17.1 (c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL AIDE WILL NOW CONDUCT TENANTS' RIGHTS CLINICS ON THE FOLLOWING DAYS ONLY EVERY TUESDAY AND THURSDAY AT 10 A.M. IN THE SELF HELP CENTER LOCATED ON THE 3RD FLOOR AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CALL THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL AIDE AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CALL CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA. 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL AIDE WILL NOW CONDUCT TENANTS' RIGHTS CLINICS ON THE FOLLOWING DAYS ONLY EVERY TUESDAY AND THURSDAY AT 10 A.M. IN THE SELF HELP CENTER LOCATED ON THE 3RD FLOOR AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CALL THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL AIDE AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CALL CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA. 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • Docket841H Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee < $10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $220.00 for AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, ITS ASSIGNEES AND/OR ... (PL-1). Received from ADVANCED ATTORNEY SERVICES INC, check no(s) 102245. Receipt #495291 for amount of $220.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 578

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aurora Loan Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANG, REBECCA L.