This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 22:40:26 (UTC).

AULDS VS AULDS

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 AULDS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AULDS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0107

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AULDS, NICOLE

Respondent

AULDS, MATHEW

 

Court Documents

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 04/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Respondent: AULDS, MATHEW

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: HEARING DATE 4/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Amended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Amended Petition - Comment: for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: Guideline calculations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion (DCSS) - Motion (DCSS) 04/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Respondent: AULDS, MATHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS - Comment: Re: CS/HC/STANDARD ORDERS/INTERVENE Hearing Date: 4/18/17 Hearing Time: 9:30AM Hearing Department/Division:R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.