This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 19:51:45 (UTC).

ATWATER VS DEERING

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 ATWATER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEERING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1350

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

Defendant

DEERING, JIM

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

04/04/2022: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

04/04/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

04/05/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

04/04/2022: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

04/05/2022: Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

04/05/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Mail Returned Undelivered

04/14/2022: Mail Returned Undelivered

Mail Returned Undelivered

04/14/2022: Mail Returned Undelivered

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

04/26/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

04/26/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

04/26/2022: Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

05/02/2022: Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit

05/02/2022: Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit

Writ of Possession Issued

05/02/2022: Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

08/02/2022: Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied; Comment: Issued 05/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Possession Issued; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit; Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Unknown Tenant. Sub service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Jim Deering. Personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Mail Returned Undelivered; Comment: Notice of Commencement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - DEERING, JIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Mail Returned Undelivered; Comment: Notice of Commencement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property; Comment: 1857 PINERIDGE ROAD FRAZIER PARK, CA 93225 KERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ATWATER, STEPHEN KARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less