This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:02 (UTC).

ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS EWING

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EWING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5781

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

EWING, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Awarded Against: EWING, JOHN; Amount; Damages: $2,587.73; Attorney Fees: $517.54; Costs: $241.00; Total: $3346.27; Party: Names: ASSET CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; EWING, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO/MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Declaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to John Ewing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 - 5 inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to John Ewing. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less