This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 05:08:48 (UTC).

ARVIN PACIFIC ASSOCIATES, LP VS COLMENERO

Case Summary

On 10/26/2015 ARVIN PACIFIC ASSOCIATES, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COLMENERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R. and Staley, H.A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0098

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARVIN PACIFIC ASSOCIATES, LP

Defendant

COLMENERO, ALMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ARVIN PACIFIC ASSOCIATES, LP; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 740 Sycamore Rd,Unit#89 Arvin, CA 93203; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Other: Plaintiff is entitled to Writ of Possession; Awarded Against: COLMENERO, ALMA; Party: Names: ARVIN PACIFIC ASSOCIATES, LP; COLMENERO, ALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Writ Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 740 Sycamore Rd, Unit#89 Arvin, CA 93203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Alma Colmenero and Any Person Claiming any Right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By substituted service as to Any Person Claiming right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Substituted Service as to Alma Colmenero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ARVIN PACIFIC ASSOCIATES, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 740 SYCAMORE ROAD UNIT #89 ARVIN, CA 93203 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.