This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2020 at 15:20:48 (UTC).

ARVIN FAMILY HOUSING LP VS. GOMEZ & IVEY

Case Summary

On 05/21/2010 ARVIN FAMILY HOUSING LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOMEZ IVEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6237

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARVIN FAMILY HOUSING LP

Defendants

GOMEZ, JOSE

IVEY, NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEAKE, ALAN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2010
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 06/02/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $1.00 for ARVIN FAMILY HOUSING LP (PL-1). Received from WALL, WALL & PEAKE, check no(s) 2368. Receipt #533134 for amount of $1.00. Detail: COPIES OF JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • Docket180C Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for ARVIN FAMILY HOUSING LP (PL-1). Received from WALL, WALL & PEAKE, check no(s) 2368. Receipt #533133 for amount of $25.00. Detail: CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED ~ calid=1269942 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:09/16/2010, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:cynthiag, SystemDate:5/24/2010 3:54:03 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: TOTAL: $2695.20 SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 07/06/10 AS TO: JOSE GOMEZ & NICOLE IVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: MONETARY DAMAGES AS TO: JOSE GOMEZ & NICOLE IVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: AS TO: JOSE GOMEZ & NICOLE IVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 06/02/10 BY: C.GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for ARVIN FAMILY HOUSING LP (PL-1). Received from WALL, WALL & PEAKE, check no(s) 2306. Receipt #526902 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2010
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: AS TO: JOSE GOMEZ & NICOLE IVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: POSSESSION ONLY AS TO: JOSE GOMEZ & NICOLE IVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: NICOLE IVEY HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 05/25/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: NICOLE IVEY HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 05/25/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON 9/16/2010 AT 1330 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 05/25/10 COPIES GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY 05/25/10 Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON 9/16/2010 AT 1330 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • Docket841H Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee < $10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $220.00 for ARVIN FAMILY HOUSING LP (PL-1). Received from WALL, WALL & PEAKE, check no(s) 2270. Receipt #525075 for amount of $220.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 687

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARVIN FAMILY HOUSING, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEAKE, ALAN J