This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 23:48:33 (UTC).

ARVIN-EDISON WATER STORAGE DISTRICT VS THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 ARVIN-EDISON WATER STORAGE DISTRICT filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. and Bradshaw, J. Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2485

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARVIN-EDISON WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

Defendants

J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY

NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC.

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

PUREGRO COMPANY

SHELL OIL COMPANY

SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY

THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINS, TODD E

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Todd E. Robins RE: Summons; Civil Case Cover Sheet REASON: Summons: doesn't conform to Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet: page 2 is missing.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/04/22 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Re: Notice of Stipulation to Coordinate Action and Notice of Jury Fees, Defendant The Dow Chemical Company has not appeared in this case, first appearance fees have not been paid.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Re: Substitution of Attorney, Defendant Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. has not appeared in this matter, no attorney on record.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Re: Substitution of Attorney, Defendant Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. has not appeared in this matter, no attorney on record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Stipulation to Coordinate Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Re: Notice of Stipulation to Coordinate Action and Notice of Jury Fees, Defendant The Dow Chemical Company has not appeared in this case, first appearance fees have not been paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Southern Valley Chemical Company, via mail service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to PureGro Company, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to J.R. Simplot Company, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment from Judge Lampe to Judge Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: City of Redlands v. Shell Oil Company, et al.San Bernardino Superior court Case No. SCVSS120627. City of Atwater v. Shell Oil Company, et al.San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-05-441058 City of Clovis v. Shell Oil Company, et al.Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. SC085170 Montara Water & Sanitary District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al.San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-05-438267 City of Oceanside v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al.San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-05-439807 City of Alhambra v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al.San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-05-441336 City of Livingston v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-05-442837 City of Shafter v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-06-453292 City of Wasco v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-06-453289 City of Delano v. The Dow Chemical Co., et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-06-453287 City of Fresno v. Shell Oil Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-07-461557 Lamont Public Utility District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-07-464670 California Water Service Co. and City of Bakersfield v. The Dow Chemical Co., et al. San Mateo Superior Court Case No. CIV470999 Sunny Slope Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. Los Angeles County Superior Court Case No. GC0446546 City of Tulare v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522770 Arvin Community Service District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522788 Vaughn Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522790 Ivanhoe Public Utility District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522791 Del Oro Water Company, Inc. v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522792 Woodville Public Utility District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522795 Orosi Public Utility District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522826 London Community Service District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al.San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522829 Earlimart Public Utility District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522832 Greenfield County Water District v. The Dow Chemical Co., et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522834 Athal Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522836 Del Rey Community Service District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-522921 City of Parlier v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-523400 Delhi County Water District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-523402 Hilmar County Water District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-523404 Winton Water and Sanitary District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-524874 City of Reedley v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al.San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-12-527321 Keyes Community Services District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-13-528088 Le Grand Community Services District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-13-530036 City of Kingsburg v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-13-534431 City of Manteca v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-14-537749 City of Hughson v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-14-542221 City of Ceres v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-15-543940 East Niles Community Services District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-15-545026 Brock Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-16-552064 Soquel Creek Water District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-16-554039 Mettler County Water District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-16-554114 Belmont Water Corporation v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-16-554925 Caruthers Community Service District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-17-558681 Belmont Country Club v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-17-558682 California-American Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-17-561378 City of Dinuba v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-17-561379 Monte Vista Water District and City of Chino v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Bernardino Superior Court Case No. CIVDS1800720 Victory Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-564612 Rio Bravo-Greeley Union School District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-566967 Superior Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-566968 Western Heights Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Bernardino Superior Court Case No. CIVDS1815524 Fuller Acres Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-567966 City of Fowler v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-567967 Mustang Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al.San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-568196 Teviston Community Services District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-568350 Western Acres Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-568625 City of McFarland v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-568838 Pixley Public Utility District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-569745 Three Crowns Industrial Park, Inc. v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-572198 Housing Authority of the County of Tulare v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-18-572199 Bakman Water Company, et al. v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-19-573170 Harvest Moon Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-19-574935 San Joaquin County v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-19-579572 Camrosa Water District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-19-579977 County of Riverside and Riverside County Service Area 62 v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. Riverside Superior Court Case No. RIC1905482 Stallion Springs Community Services District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-19-580517 Kings Canyon Unified School District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-583017 City of Modesto v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-583345 City of Kerman v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-584598 Wini Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-584947 Goose Lake Water Property Owners Association v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-585358 Goose Lake Water Property Owners Association v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-585358 Olivehurst Public Utility District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-586488 County of Madera, et al., v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-587618 City of Lodi v. Shell Oil Company, et al. San Joaquin Superior Court Case No. STK-CV-UETT-2020-9894 City of Riverside v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-20-588295 Delano Growers Grape Products v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-21-588960 North Kranenburg Water System Mutual Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-21-589578 West Valley Water District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-21-590529 Selma Unified School District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. Fresno Superior Court Case No. 21CECG01434 McSwain Union Elementary School District v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. Merced Superior Court Case No. 21CV-01697 The Regents of the University of California v. The Dow Chemical Company, et al. San Francisco Superior Court Case No. CGC-21-594867

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Refund Request per Govt. Code Section 6103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/04/22 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Todd E. Robins RE: Summons; Civil Case Cover Sheet REASON: Summons: doesn't conform to Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet: page 2 is missing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/05/20212:34 PM; Served: 11/05/202112:40 PM; Served: 11/05/202112:40 PM; Served: 11/05/20212:34 PM; Served: 11/05/202112:40 PM; Served: 11/03/2021; Served: 11/05/202112:40 PM; Served: 11/08/202110:41 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ARVIN-EDISON WATER STORAGE DISTRICT A CALIFORNIA WATER STORAGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc. is a litigant