This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 10:29:22 (UTC).

ARVIN APARTMENT VS NEVAREZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2003 ARVIN APARTMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NEVAREZ,. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4179

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARVIN APARTMENTS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

AVILA, CANDELARIA

NEVAREZ, ALFREDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAHL, RONALD W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2003
  • DocketWrit Returned and Filed - Comment: Fully satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2003
  • Docket115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for ARVIN APARTMENTS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PL-1). Received from RONALD W DAHL, check no(s) 9353. Receipt #57196 for amount of $7.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2003
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: FOR KERN COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CESAR ERAZO APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR ARVIN APARTMENTS. RICHARD MONAHAN APPEARS FOR RONALD W DAHL. THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: CESAR ERAZO ROBERTO LUCERO PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR ALFREDO NEVAREZ AND CANDELARIA AVILA. ALFREDO NEVAREZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. CANDELARIA AVILA (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. JUDGMENT FOR ARVIN APARTMENTS, AGAINST ALFREDO NEVAREZ AND CANDELARIA AVILA, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $0.00, COSTS $198.30, ATTORNEY FEES $250.00, MISC FEES $0.00 FOR A TOTAL OF $448.30. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. PREMISES TO BE VACATED BY 4 PM ON 10-24-03, PLAINTIFF GETS COURT COSTS, ATTORNEY FEES AND RENT OF $5.16 PER DAY UNTIL 10-24-03. IF DEFENDANT IS PAID THRU 10-31-03 THEY ARE ENTITLED TO A REFUND OF THE DIFFERENCE. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):721A,5904/722A,1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: New Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: UD COURT TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • DocketMemorandum to Set Court Trial Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2003
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CANDELARIA AVILA (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY ARVIN APARTMENTS MATTER DROPPED . ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):508A-5936 & 509A-1501.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2003
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: New Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2003
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY CANDELARIA AVILA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2003
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment: REGARDING ANSWER FOR UNLAWFUL DETANER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2003
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER WHO: CANDELARIA AVILA HOW: PERSONAL SERVICE/PROCESS SERVER WHEN: 08/28/03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2003
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2003
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT WHO: ALFREDO NEVAREZ HOW: LEAVING COPIES WITH CANDELARIA AVILA WHEN: 07/30/03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2003
  • DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • Docket841 Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 (6/1/03) - Comment: Amount of $119.30 for ARVIN APARTMENTS, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PL-1). Received from RONALD W DAHL, check no(s) 9043. Receipt #40471 for amount of $119.30.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAHL, RONALD W