This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 03:09:25 (UTC).

ARTES JACKSON VS JACKSON JR.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 ARTES JACKSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JACKSON JR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0399

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARTES JACKSON, MARY ALICE

Respondent

JACKSON JR., WILLIAM E.

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: ARTES JACKSON, MARY ALICE

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 05/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: income improved per I&E submitted with default

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketOrder on Crt Fee Waiver After Reconsideration Hrg - Ended - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 06/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketOrder on Crt Fee Waiver After Reconsideration Hrg - Ended - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees - Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 05/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: income improved per I&E submitted with default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice To Appear For Reconsideration Of Fee Waiver (FW-011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.