This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 14:06:49 (UTC).

ARNISON ET AL VS ADVENTIST HEALTH ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 ARNISON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0051

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARNISON, NAOMI

ARNISON, MARIA

Defendants

ASH, DO, LORRAINE

GALLEGO,FNP, SCOTT

MANU M.D., RAJEEV

ADVENTIST HEALTH BAKESFIELD

MANY M.D., SHERIN

ARENE, M.D., IKECHUKWU

AMIN M.D., NAVINCHANDRA MANIBHAI

DELEON, PA, ENRIQUE Q.

MEHBOOB M.D., ATHER

KHEMTHONG M.D., APINUNT

ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK

RAMOS, FNP, MARIE

ACCELRATED URGENT CARE

HELSTON, FNP, BRENDON

ADVENTIST HEALTH

CALIFORNIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS MEDICAL GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES GROUP, A MEDICAL CORPORATION

HOSPITALIST MEDICINE PHYSICIANS OF CALIFORNIA, INC

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEINBERG, STEVEN J

Defendant Attorneys

HASKINS, ANGELA S

WHITE, WILLIAM M

LEVINE, HARMON B

HOFFMAN, BRIAN L

THELEN, DENNIS R

CONNELY, MARK B

DUMMIT, CRAIG S

Other Attorneys

TOMLINSON, RODNEY G

ROSEN, ZACHARY S

SCHAEFFER, JAMES C

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Steven Weinberg Re: Summons And GAL Application Reason:Rosie, please resubmit the Summons with the correct court address, 1415 Truxtun Ave Bakesfield Ca 93301. Also, please revise the 2nd page, the second signature-change to minors name, per our conversation. thank you

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons: Defendant names must be match complaint exactly. Please correct and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation and Proposed Order: Please correct the name of the defaulted party, it must match the default exactly also the answer can be attached as an exhibit but must be submitted separately for filing. Any questions please call the clerk's office at 661-868-7204

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation and Proposed Order: Please correct the name of the defaulted party, it must match the default exactly also the answer can be attached as an exhibit but must be submitted separately for filing. Any questions please call the clerk's office at 661-868-7204

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/25/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *as to defendant IKECHUKWU ARENE, M.D. Continued from 04/22/2020 by Standing Order

Ruling

Ruling 06/30/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 08/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 12 DAYS JURY FOR ALL PARTIES EXCEPT 3 DEFENDANTS THAT HAVE NOT POSTED FEES APINUNT KHEMTHONG M.D., BRENDON HELSTON, FNP, AND NAVINCHANDRA MANIBHAI AMIN M.D - THEY HAVE WAIVED JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 11/22/21 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 12 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 11/23/2020 Defendant, LORRAINE M ASH, D.O. Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared MSJ/MSA/Anti-Slapp - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Pre-Cleared Reservation Rescheduled; Comment: Reserved: 10/19 Expires: 10/23 Defendant LORRAINE ASH Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury - Comment: Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer Ricardo Rodriguez MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Doe 8: Ricardo Rodriguez, M.D. via Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt.

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Adventist Health via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Accelerated Urgent Care via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Comment: Shelly Allredge is appointed Guardian Ad Litem for Naomi Arnison.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons: Defendant names must be match complaint exactly. Please correct and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/17/2020; Served: 01/17/2020; Served: 01/17/2020; Served: 05/31/202012:02 PM; Served: 01/21/2020; Served: 06/11/2020; Served: 06/06/202011:33 AM; Served: 06/16/2020; Served: 07/07/2020; Served: 01/24/2020; Served: 06/16/2020; Served: 02/20/20204:09 PM; Served: 01/27/2020; Served: 02/19/202012:29 PM; Served: 02/13/202012:03 PM; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 06/09/202010:50 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Steven Weinberg Re: Summons And GAL Application Reason:Rosie, please resubmit the Summons with the correct court address, 1415 Truxtun Ave Bakesfield Ca 93301. Also, please revise the 2nd page, the second signature-change to minors name, per our conversation. thank you

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/22/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospitalist Medicine Physicians of California, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH PHYSICIANS NETWORK AKA LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE URGENT CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS MEDICAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL is a litigant