This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 08:41:42 (UTC).

ARMENDARIZ VS REDDY

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 ARMENDARIZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against REDDY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2945

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMENDARIZ, ALMA

Defendants

ENCOMPASS HEALTH REHABILITATION HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, LLC

REDDY, SANDEEP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCARDIGLI, NICHOLAS J

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH, PAUL M

BARRITT, DOUGLAS A

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/07/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 6/15/21

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/01/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 4/3/23 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: Jury Trial/Final Case Management Conference hearings are set on April 3, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 11. Mandatory Settlement Conference hearing is set on March 3, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 09/07/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 6/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Sandeep Reddy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Defendant Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Bakersfield, Llc s Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital Of Bakersfield, LLC via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 12/18/20201:37 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/01/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCOMPASS HEALTH REHABILITATION HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCARDIGLI, NICHOLAS J.