This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 16:58:41 (UTC).

ARIES VS ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 ARIES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ORTEGA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2085

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARIES, RENE

Defendants

ORTEGA, EDMUND

CALIFORNIA CITY

CALIFORNIA CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL, CHRISTOPHER E

Defendant Attorneys

STEAD, CALVIN R

HENGESBACH, DAREN E

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Stipuation to Continue Trial Dates filed 4/29/19; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HENGESBACH, DAREN E; Defendant; Attorney: HENGESBACH, DAREN E; Defendant; Attorney: HENGESBACH, DAREN E

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney: Duplicate document received re: California City Police Dept.

Ruling

Ruling 04/30/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney: Form can only be used as to 1 party. File a substitution of attorney form for each party.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Signature of current attorney is missing from Notice of Association pleading. Refile with signature from Calvin R Stead.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/21/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5-7 DAYS JURY FOR DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF WAIVED ABSENT FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 7/6/20 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 5-7 DAYS JURY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 3-5 DAYS JURY FOR DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF WAIVED JURY ABSENT FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 6/10/19 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 3-5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 05/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Stipuation to Continue Trial Dates filed 4/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney: Duplicate document received re: California City Police Dept.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: EXTENSION GRANTED - Responsive Pleading shall be filed not later than January 10, 2018 ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE****12/8/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO EDMUND ORTEGA, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/01/2017; Served: 12/19/2017; Served: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/21/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.