This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 23:39:15 (UTC).

ARIAS VS GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 ARIAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0841

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARIAS, GONZALO

MARIA GLORIA ALVAREZ DIAZ AS THE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF GONZALO ARIAS

Defendants

GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

M.A. MEDINA FARM LABOR SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEREMIAN, DAVID

Defendant Attorney

KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K

 

Court Documents

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing RULING MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 7/15/16: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer

Further Case Management Conference

4/25/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Cont'd from 02/23/16); Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K; Defendant; Attorney: KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K

Case Management Conference

02/23/16 - MO - Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Time Estimate: 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: held the morning of trial- 7 day time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E 7 DAYS FCMC 1/9/17 TD 1/9/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC, Rule 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay) - Comment: With prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 6/29/16 Plaintiff, GONZALO ARIAS successor in interest MARIA GLORIA ALVAREZ DIAZ Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas issued by Defendant Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 1987.1 or in the alternative a protective order ResID: 17349 Transferred to Department 17 for hearing only. Department 4 is dark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS) - Comment: Filed by Roman Shkodnik, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 12:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Ruling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Extension granted, responsive pleadings to be filed no later than 11/5/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Certificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: Filed by Daniel K. Klingenberger, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to M.A. Medina Farm Labor Services, Inc. sub served 10/5/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. personal service 9/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/10/15 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY DAVID YEREMIAN CMC 2/23/16 @ 8AM D4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.