This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:50:39 (UTC).

ARIAS VS BAKERSFIELD AUTO EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 ARIAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD AUTO EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1606

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARIAS, NATALIE

Defendant

BAKERSFIELD AUTO EXCHANGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ARIAS, NATALIE; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER *A

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.