This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 09:04:14 (UTC).

ARANA ET AL VS RUIZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 ARANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0167

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARANA, ANGELICA

ARANA, JOSE

Defendants

RUIZ, MARTHA

BAKERSFIELD AMERICAN INDIAN HEALTH PROJECT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYLES CHAD JA

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/19/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

01/19/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

01/19/2023: Order to Show Cause

Answer to Complaint

02/14/2023: Answer to Complaint

Answer to Complaint

02/22/2023: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/15/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/15/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - RUIZ, MARTHA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Bakersfield American Indian Health, via Electronic service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ARANA, ANGELICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Martha Ruiz, via Personal Service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ARANA, ANGELICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BAKERSFIELD AMERICAN INDIAN HEALTH PROJECT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 5/4/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ARANA, ANGELICA|PLAINTIFF - ARANA, JOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ARANA, ANGELICA|PLAINTIFF - ARANA, JOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ARANA, ANGELICA|PLAINTIFF - ARANA, JOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less