This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 07:58:27 (UTC).

ARANA ET AL VS RUIZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 ARANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, T. Mark, Zulfa, David and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0167

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, T. Mark

Zulfa, David

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARANA, ANGELICA

ARANA, JOSE

Defendants

RUIZ, MARTHA

BAKERSFIELD AMERICAN INDIAN HEALTH PROJECT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYLES, CHAD J A

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDENTHAL, DANIEL R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/19/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

01/19/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

01/19/2023: Order to Show Cause

Answer to Complaint

02/14/2023: Answer to Complaint

Answer to Complaint

02/22/2023: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/15/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/15/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Case Management Statement

07/03/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

07/03/2023: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

07/03/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Motion

07/05/2023: Notice of Motion

Separate Statement

07/05/2023: Separate Statement

Notice of Motion

07/05/2023: Notice of Motion

Separate Statement

07/05/2023: Separate Statement

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

01/19/2023: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Case Management Conference 07/18/2023

07/18/2023: Case Management Conference 07/18/2023

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100167; Style/Defendant: ARANA ET AL VS RUIZ ET AL; Case Type: 22-CV Auto - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Jury Trial; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E: 6 days Plaintiff's jury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100167; Style/Defendant: ARANA ET AL VS RUIZ ET AL; Case Type: 22-CV Auto - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2024
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: JT: 07/01/24 T/E: 6 days Plaintiff's jury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100167; Style/Defendant: ARANA ET AL VS RUIZ ET AL; Case Type: 22-CV Auto - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judge: Zulfa, David; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division J; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Jury Trial set for 7/1/2024 in Dept T-2, TE 6 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: FILED 7/5/23 PLAINTIFF MOTION TO MARTHA RUIZ FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF TANYA D. ALSHEIKH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: FILED 7/5/23 PLAINTIFF MOTION TO BAKERSFIELD AMERICAN INDIAN HEALTH PROJECT S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF TANYA D. ALSHEIKH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketNotice; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Motions to Compel Further Discovery Responses 8/3/2023 8:30 a.m. Traffic Courtroom 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Bakersfield American Indian Health, via Electronic service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Martha Ruiz, via Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 02/10/20236:28 PM; Served: 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 5/4/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less