This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:29:38 (UTC).

ANTONIO PADILLA OGAS DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ANTONIO PADILLA OGAS DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2967

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

OGAS, CATHERINE

OGAS, VICTORIA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILSON, JOSHUA G

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing

Petition 11/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Compliance hearing re: 12200 status report or petition to close estate 11/22/2019 CALENDAR #3

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: waiver of notice......returned via mail

Petition

Petition 08/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition to remove administrator and to appoint successor administrator 08/29/2019 CALENDAR #1

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration of Victoria Ogas & Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action... SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: declaration.....attorney outbasket

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 08/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 08/08/19, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close estate has been not filed. 08/23/19 CALENDAR #01

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 06/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 06/12/19, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close estate has been not filed.

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 12/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE 1. As of 11/29/18, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close estate has been not filed.

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 12/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -; Parties Present Petitioner: OGAS, CATHERINE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via We help you legal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Appear - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CATHERINE OGAS TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT AND SHOW THE CONDITION OF THE ESTATE AND THE REASONS WHY THE ESTATE CANNOT BE DISTRIBUTED AND CLOSED PURSUANT TO PC 12202, AND WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED UP TO $1,500.00 PURSUANT TO CCP 177.5 FOR FAILURE TO FOLLOW COURT ORDERS, AND FAILURE TO FILE ACCOUNT AS ORDERED BY THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: RE: ACCOUNTING FROM CATHERINE OGAS OR TURN OVER OF ALL FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS TO ATTORNEY ANTON LABRENTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: RE: EITHER A REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATOR PURSUANT TO PC 12200 ET SEQ. OR PETITION TO CLOSE THE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketPetition - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 4/1/2020, HEARING CONTINUED TO A FUTURE DATE TO BE DETERMINED*** Petition for Order for Claim of Possession, Damages, and Surcharge of Former Administrator, and for Removal of Real Property Tenant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPetition (Subsequent) - Comment: Petition for Order for Claim of Possession, Damages, and Surcharge of Former Administrator, and for Removal of Real Property Tenant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Death (Non-JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketLetters (Non-JBSIS) - Comment: Of Administration Prior Letters issued on: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: copy of drivers license

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 12/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 12/07/2017 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketLetters of Special Administration - Comment: Catherine Ogas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Administrator - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Catherine Ogas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via We help you legal

    Read MoreRead Less